US SB2905 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening Partnerships to Prevent Opioid Abuse Act of 2018 This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to establish a secure online portal to allow: (1) data sharing among the CMS, Medicare prescription drug benefit plans, and Medicare Advantage (MA) plans; and (2) referrals by such plans of suspicious activities related to fraud, waste, or abuse in order to initiate or assist investigations by contracted entities under the Medicare Integrity Program. The CMS must disseminate and report certain collected information to such plans, including information regarding providers that were referred through the portal and trends in identifying suspicious activity. Additionally, for plan years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, MA organizations must submit information to the CMS regarding credible evidence of suspected fraud or other actions taken by MA plans regarding inappropriate prescribing of opioids (as determined by the CMS).
Title
Strengthening Partnerships to Prevent Opioid Abuse Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5715 (Related) 2018-06-12 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-737, Part I.
HB5773 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3120 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5773 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3120 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2905/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2905/BILLS-115s2905is.pdf |