US SB2941 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 644.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 644.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening the Cooperative Observer Program Act of 2018
Title
Strengthening the Cooperative Observer Program Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 644. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-357. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2951 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Department of Commerce
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications
Department of Commerce
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications