US SB3028 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Daniel J. Evans Olympic National Park Wilderness Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Washington Park Wilderness Act of 1988 to redesignate the Olympic Wilderness as the "Daniel J. Evans Wilderness."
Title
Daniel J. Evans Olympic National Park Wilderness Act
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 401 N: 8 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 401 N: 8 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 401 N: 8 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-272. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-12 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 8, 2 Present (Roll no. 612). (text: CR 12/7/2016 H7215) |
2016-12-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7301-7302) |
2016-12-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3028. |
2016-12-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7215) |
2016-12-06 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 157. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-822. |
2016-09-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-09-22 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2016-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2016-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-07-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5187; text as passed Senate: CR S5187) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 571. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5397 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats