US SB349 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation (DOT) to publish in the Federal Register and on the DOT website a request for nominations for roads to be designated under the national scenic byways program and a list of the roads designated.
Title
Reviving America's Scenic Byways Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-09-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5366; text: CR S5366) |
2019-07-23 | Senate | By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-61. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 116. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S920-921) |
Same As/Similar To
HB831 (Related) 2019-09-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-57. (TXT | PDF)
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
Subjects
Government information and archives
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Travel and tourism
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Travel and tourism