US SB3499 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide emergency acquisition authority for purposes of replenishing United States stockpiles.
Title
Securing American ARMS Act of 2023 Securing American Acquisitions, Readiness, and Military Stockpiles Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
HB6217 (Related) 2023-11-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB2055 (Related) 2023-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB6217 (Related) 2023-11-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB2055 (Related) 2023-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/3499/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s3499/BILLS-118s3499is.pdf |