US SB3846 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-323.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-323.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the Justice and Mental Health Collaboration Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Justice and Mental Health Collaboration Reauthorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-29 - House - Final Passage Under Suspension of the Rules Results (Y: 389 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-323. |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-14 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 3846 by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-14 | Senate | Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 3846 by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2022-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 22 (Roll no. 487). (text: CR H8618-8619) |
2022-11-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8643-8644) |
2022-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3846. |
2022-11-29 | House | Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8618-8622) |
2022-07-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-07-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3149; text: CR S3149) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 369. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8166 (Same As) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.