US SB387 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Chance Act Fair Chance to Compete for Jobs Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Chance Act Fair Chance to Compete for Jobs Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
2019-04-10SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-33.
2019-02-13SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-02-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1076 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback