US SB395 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the notice of a proposed rule by a federal agency to include the Internet address of a summary of the rule. The summary must be 100 words or fewer, written in plain language, and posted on regulations.gov.
Title
Providing Accountability Through Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3326; text: CR S3326) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 45. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-14. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1087 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics