US SB4458 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Became Public Law No: 117-174.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Became Public Law No: 117-174.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the process by which the Secretary of Veterans Affairs determines whether an educational institution meets requirements relating to the percentage of students who receive educational assistance furnished by the Secretary, and for other purposes.
Title
Ensuring the Best Schools for Veterans Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-26 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-174. |
2022-08-26 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-08-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-08-12 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7704-7705) |
2022-08-12 | House | Mr. Takano asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2022-08-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7704-7705) |
2022-08-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-08-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4034) |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4034) |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8198 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.