US SB4524 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on December 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-07 - Became Public Law No: 117-224.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on December 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-07 - Became Public Law No: 117-224.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to limit the judicial enforceability of predispute nondisclosure and nondisparagement contract clauses relating to disputes involving sexual assault and sexual harassment.
Title
Speak Out Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-16 - House - Passage of a Measure (Y: 315 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-224. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-16 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 315 - 109 (Roll no. 480). (text: CR H8518) |
2022-11-16 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 4524. |
2022-11-16 | House | Rule provides for consideration of S. 4524 with 1 hour of general debate. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that any time through the legislative day of Nov. 18, 2022, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or a designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative day of November 14, 15, 16, 17, and 18, 2022, on which the yeas and nays were postponed. The resolution provides that H.Res. 1463 is hereby adopted and one motion to commit. |
2022-11-16 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1464. (consideration: CR H8518-8525) |
2022-11-15 | House | Rule H. Res. 1464 passed House. |
2022-11-14 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1464 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S. 4524 with 1 hour of general debate. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that any time through the legislative day of Nov. 18, 2022, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or a designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative day of November 14, 15, 16, 17, and 18, 2022, on which the yeas and nays were postponed. The resolution provides that H.Res. 1463 is hereby adopted and one motion to commit. |
2022-09-30 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-09-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-09-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6050; text: CR S6050) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493. |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8227 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
HR1464 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1464 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.