US SB4598 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to provide for assistance for small manufacturers in the defense industrial supply chain on matters relating to cybersecurity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to provide for assistance for small manufacturers in the defense industrial supply chain on matters relating to cybersecurity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Same As/Similar To

HB6395 (Related) 2020-08-05 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.
HB7265 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback