US SB4902 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-245. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-245. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the U.S. courthouse at 351 South West Temple in Salt Lake City, Utah, as the Orrin G. Hatch United States Courthouse.
Title
A bill to designate the United States courthouse located at 351 South West Temple in Salt Lake City, Utah, as the "Orrin G. Hatch United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-245. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6987) |
2020-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4902. |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6987-6988) |
2020-12-08 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-11-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7024-7025; text: CR S7025) |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Senate
Utah
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Senate
Utah