US SB522 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 280.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 280.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Salmon Lake Land Selection Resolution Act - Ratifies the Salmon Lake Area Land Ownership and Consolidation Agreement, which was initially executed by the United States, the state of Alaska, and the Bering Straits Native Corporation on July 18, 2007. Requires the conveyance to include specified easements developed and agreed upon by the parties. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to carry out all actions required by the Agreement.
Title
Salmon Lake Land Selection Resolution Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 280. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 111-130. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | |
2009-10-08 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-285. | |
2009-03-04 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-03-04 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2767-2768) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2340 (Same As) 2010-07-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 457.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers