US SB593 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the John D. Dingell, Jr. Conservation, Management, and Recreation Act to establish the Cerro de la Olla Wilderness in the Rio Grande del Norte National Monument and to modify the boundary of the Rio Grande del Norte National Monument.
Title
Cerro de la Olla Wilderness Establishment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 118-54. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1303 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.