US SB605 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 122.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 122.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dangerous Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2011 or David Mitchell Rozga Act - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to add as a schedule I controlled substance any material, compound, mixture, or preparation which contains specified cannabimimetic agents (or the salts, isomers, or salts of isomers thereof). Extends the period during which the Attorney General may temporarily schedule a substance in schedule I to avoid an imminent hazard to public safety to two years with a one-year extension (currently, one year with a six-month extension).
Title
Dangerous Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 122. |
2011-07-29 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report. |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Committee on United States Senate Caucus on International Narcotics Control. Hearings held. |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1830-1831) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1254 (Related) 2011-12-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3189 (Related) 2012-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3190 (Related) 2012-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3189 (Related) 2012-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3190 (Related) 2012-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.