US SB778 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to issue to a veteran a card, to be known as a Veterans ID Card, that identifies the veteran as a veteran and includes the veteran's name and photo. Allows the Secretary to issue such a card regardless of whether the veteran is: (1) enrolled in the VA system of annual patient enrollment; or (2) in receipt of VA educational assistance, compensation, or pension. Authorizes the Secretary to work with national retail chains that offer veterans reduced prices on pharmaceutical and consumer products to ensure that such chains recognize the above cards when offering such prices.
Title
A bill to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to issue cards to veterans that identify them as veterans, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB944 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/778/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s778/BILLS-113s778is.pdf |