US SB832 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15-1)
Status: Passed on November 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-06 - Became Public Law No: 111-95.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15-1)
Status: Passed on November 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-06 - Became Public Law No: 111-95.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grants a federal charter to the Military Officers Association of America (a nonprofit corporation and incorporated under the laws of the Commonwealth of Virginia).
Title
A bill to amend title 36, United States Code, to grant a Federal charter to the Military Officers Association of America, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-06 | Became Public Law No: 111-95. | |
2009-11-06 | Signed by President. | |
2009-10-30 | Presented to President. | |
2009-10-27 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-10-27 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-10-27 | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H11826-11827) | |
2009-10-27 | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H11826-11827) | |
2009-10-27 | Mr. Van Hollen asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. | |
2009-09-25 | Held at the desk. | |
2009-09-25 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-09-25 | Received in the House. | |
2009-09-24 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9857) | |
2009-09-24 | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9856-9857) | |
2009-04-20 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2017 (Same As) 2009-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
SB1449 (Same As) 2009-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1455 (Same As) 2009-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1449 (Same As) 2009-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1455 (Same As) 2009-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Federally chartered organizations
Military personnel and dependents
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations