US SB862 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-70. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-70. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends by three years the increased threshold for the minimum major-disaster loan amount for which the Small Business Administration may require collateral. It also requires the Government Accountability Office to report on the performance of such loans.
Title
Rebuilding Small Businesses After Disasters Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-70. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9102) |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9101-9102) |
2019-11-20 | House | Ms. Craig asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2019-08-02 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-08-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.937 Amendment SA 937 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.937 Amendment SA 937 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Kennedy. (consideration: CR S5321; text: CR S5321) To amend the title. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.936 Amendment SA 936 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.936 Amendment SA 936 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Kennedy. (consideration: CR S5320-5321; text: CR S5320-5321) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5320-5321) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 54. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Rubio without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |