US SB872 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Holding Company Registration Threshold Equalization Act of 2013 - Amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to require an issuer that is a savings and loan holding company to register with the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) if: (1) its assets exceed $10 million, and (2) it has a class of equity security held of record by 2,000 or more persons. Requires termination of such registration after a savings and loan holding company certifies that its holders of record of such class of security has been reduced to fewer than 1,200 persons. Suspends automatically the duty of a savings and loan holding company to file supplementary and periodic information if the securities of each class to which the registration statement relates (other than any class of asset-backed securities) are held of record by fewer than 1,200 persons.
Title
Holding Company Registration Threshold Equalization Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB801 (Related) 2014-01-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB798 (Related) 2014-01-08 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Protection. Hearings held.
HB5405 (Related) 2014-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB798 (Related) 2014-01-08 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Protection. Hearings held.
HB5405 (Related) 2014-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Finance and financial sector
Licensing and registrations
Securities
Finance and financial sector
Licensing and registrations
Securities
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/872/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s872/BILLS-113s872is.pdf |