US SB882 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the entitlement to educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program of the Department of Veterans Affairs for members of the Armed Forces awarded the Purple Heart, and for other purposes. This bill entitles members of the Armed Forces who have been awarded the Purple Heart for service occurring on or after September 11, 2001, to educational assistance under the Department of Veterans Affairs' Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program. Such individuals are also eligible to participate in the Yellow Ribbon G.I. Education Enhancement Program.
Title
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the entitlement to educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program of the Department of Veterans Affairs for members of the Armed Forces awarded the Purple Heart, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1379 (Related) 2017-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Higher education
Public-private cooperation
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Conflicts and wars
Higher education
Public-private cooperation
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/882/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s882/BILLS-115s882is.pdf |