US SB886 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Smart Energy and Water Efficiency Act of 2015 This bill amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to require the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish and carry out a smart energy and water efficiency pilot program to award grants to utilities, municipalities, water districts, and other water authorities for demonstrating novel and innovative technology-based solutions that will: increase the energy efficiency of water, wastewater, and water reuse systems; improve those systems to help communities make significant progress in conserving water, saving energy, and reducing costs; and support the implementation of innovative processes and the installation of advanced automated systems that provide real-time data on energy and water. DOE must annually evaluate each grant project and make best practices identified in the evaluations available to the public.
Title
Smart Energy and Water Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3143 (Related) 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
Subjects
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/886/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s886/BILLS-114s886is.pdf |