US SB910 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Grand Ronde Reservation Act, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend the Grand Ronde Reservation Act, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251. |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 118-113. |
2023-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1722 (Related) 2023-12-26 - Became Public Law No: 118-32.