US SB936 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Small Business Act to include requirements relating to graduates of career and technical education programs or programs of study for small business development centers and women's business centers, and for other purposes.
Title
Supporting Small Business and Career and Technical Education Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164. |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Cardin with an amendment. Without written report. |
2023-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1730 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 78.