US SJR21 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - Limits Members of the House of Representatives to three terms and Members of the Senate to two terms.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to limiting the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve to 3 in the House of Representatives and 2 in the Senate.
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Brownback [R-KS] | Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] | Sen. Jim DeMint [R-SC] | Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-10 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR14 (Related) 2009-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR67 (Related) 2010-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR1 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR67 (Related) 2010-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR1 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/21/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/sjres21/BILLS-111sjres21is.pdf |