US SR106 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1507; text: CR S1505)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1507; text: CR S1505)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing Girl Scouts of the United States of America on its 109th birthday and celebrating its legacy of fostering civic action and community service among girls and creating leaders in Gold Award Girl Scouts, including the 2020 National Gold Award Girl Scouts.
Title
A resolution recognizing Girl Scouts of the United States of America on its 109th birthday and celebrating its legacy of fostering civic action and community service among girls and creating leaders in Gold Award Girl Scouts, including the 2020 National Gold Award Girl Scouts.
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1507; text: CR S1505) |
Same As/Similar To
HR231 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR978 (Related) 2022-03-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR542 (Related) 2022-03-10 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1123-1124)
HR978 (Related) 2022-03-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR542 (Related) 2022-03-10 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1123-1124)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/106/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres106/BILLS-117sres106ats.pdf |