US SR214 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2530-2531; text: CR S2527)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2530-2531; text: CR S2527)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the designation of May 13, 2021, as "National Senior Fraud Awareness Day" to raise awareness about the increasing number of fraudulent scams targeted at seniors in the United States, to encourage the implementation of policies to prevent those scams from happening, and to improve protections from those scams for seniors.
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of May 13, 2021, as "National Senior Fraud Awareness Day" to raise awareness about the increasing number of fraudulent scams targeted at seniors in the United States, to encourage the implementation of policies to prevent those scams from happening, and to improve protections from those scams for seniors.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2530-2531; text: CR S2527) |
Same As/Similar To
HR392 (Related) 2021-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
SR655 (Related) 2022-05-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2737-2738; text: CR S2758-2759)
SR655 (Related) 2022-05-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2737-2738; text: CR S2758-2759)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/214/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres214/BILLS-117sres214ats.pdf |