US SR217 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-01 - Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6259; text as passed Senate: CR S6237)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-01 - Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6259; text as passed Senate: CR S6237)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the designation of American College of Surgeons Days. Recognizes: (1) the 100th anniversary of the American College of Surgeons, and (2) its many important contributions to the welfare of surgical patients and the U.S. health care system.
Title
A resolution expressing support for designation of October 6, 2013, through October 10, 2013, as "American College of Surgeons Days" and recognizing the 100th anniversary of the founding of the organization.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-01 | House | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6259; text as passed Senate: CR S6237) |
Same As/Similar To
HR307 (Same As) 2013-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Surgery and anesthesia
Congressional tributes
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Surgery and anesthesia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/217/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres217/BILLS-113sres217ats.pdf |