US SR231 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3382; text: CR S3338)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3382; text: CR S3338)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of May 17, 2021, as "DIPG Pediatric Brain Cancer Awareness Day" to raise awareness of and encourage research on diffuse intrinsic pontine glioma tumors and pediatric cancers in general.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of May 17, 2021, as "DIPG Pediatric Brain Cancer Awareness Day" to raise awareness of and encourage research on diffuse intrinsic pontine glioma tumors and pediatric cancers in general.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3382; text: CR S3338) |
Same As/Similar To
HR404 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR642 (Related) 2022-05-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2535; text: CR S2550)
SR642 (Related) 2022-05-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2535; text: CR S2550)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/231/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres231/BILLS-117sres231ats.pdf |