US SR254 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 5/27/2021 CR S3905-3906)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 5/27/2021 CR S3905-3906)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of May 2021 as "Mental Health Awareness Month".
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of May 2021 as "Mental Health Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 5/27/2021 CR S3905-3906) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4501) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HR365 (Related) 2021-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.