US SR262 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5584-5585; text as passed Senate: CR S5584; text of measure as introduced: CR S5582)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5584-5585; text as passed Senate: CR S5584; text of measure as introduced: CR S5582)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week of September 12-September 16, 2011, as National Health Information Technology Week. Calls on interested parties to promote the use of information technology and management systems to transform the U.S. health care system.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning on September 12, 2011, and ending on September 16, 2011, as "National Health Information Technology Week" to recognize the value of health information technology in improving health quality.
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-13 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5584-5585; text as passed Senate: CR S5584; text of measure as introduced: CR S5582) |
Same As/Similar To
SR562 (Related) 2012-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6469-6472; text as passed Senate: CR S6469-6470; text of measure as introduced: CR S6465)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/262/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres262/BILLS-112sres262ats.pdf |