US SR267 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 06/27/2019 S4635-4636)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 06/27/2019 S4635-4636)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the September 11th National Memorial Trail, which will pass through the states of Virginia, Maryland, West Virginia, Pennsylvania, New Jersey, New York, Delaware, and the District of Columbia, as an important trail and greenway honoring the heroes of the September 11, 2001, terrorist attack in the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the September 11th National Memorial Trail as an important trail and greenway all individuals should enjoy in honor of the heroes of September 11th.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 06/27/2019 S4635-4636) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5452) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HR384 (Same As) 2019-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Subjects
District of Columbia
Maryland
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
New Jersey
New York City
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Terrorism
Virginia
Maryland
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
New Jersey
New York City
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Terrorism
Virginia