US SR374 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S302)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S302)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of February 12, 2018, as "Darwin Day" and recognizing the importance of science in the betterment of humanity.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of February 12, 2018, as "Darwin Day" and recognizing the importance of science in the betterment of humanity.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S302) |
Same As/Similar To
SR59 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1091-1092)
HR699 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HR44 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HR699 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HR44 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Subjects
Biological and life sciences
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Genetics
Science, technology, communications
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Genetics
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/374/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres374/BILLS-115sres374is.pdf |