US SR44 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating February 6 through 10, 2017, as "National School Counseling Week". Designates February 6-February 10, 2017, as National School Counseling Week.
Title
A resolution designating February 6 through 10, 2017, as "National School Counseling Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1092) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S681) |
Same As/Similar To
HR108 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR397 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S697-698; text: CR S707)
SR397 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S697-698; text: CR S707)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula