US SR513 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5314)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5314)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the 70th anniversary of the Warsaw Uprising, which occurred during World War II and serves as a symbol of heroism and the power of the human spirit.
Title
A resolution honoring the 70th anniversary of the Warsaw Uprising.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5314) |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 496. |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4770) |
Same As/Similar To
HR690 (Same As) 2014-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Europe
Germany
International affairs
Poland
World history
Conflicts and wars
Europe
Germany
International affairs
Poland
World history