US SR556 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/04/2020 CR S2216-2217)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/04/2020 CR S2216-2217)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates May 1, 2020, as United States Foreign Service Day and honors the men and women who serve in the Foreign Service.
Title
A resolution designating May 1, 2020, as the "United States Foreign Service Day" in recognition of the men and women who have served, or are presently serving, in the Foreign Service of the United States, and honoring the members of the Foreign Service who have given their lives in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/04/2020 CR S2216-2217) |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2609-2610) |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
International affairs
Congressional tributes
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
International affairs