US SR604 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2478; text: CR S2475)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2478; text: CR S2475)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating March 21, 2024, as "National Women in Agriculture Day".
Title
A resolution designating March 21, 2024, as "National Women in Agriculture Day".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2478; text: CR S2475) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1105 (Related) 2024-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
SR120 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1081; text: 03/23/2023 CR S936)
SR120 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1081; text: 03/23/2023 CR S936)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/604/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres604/BILLS-118sres604ats.pdf |