US SR653 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7666-7669; text as passed Senate: CR S7666; text of measure as introduced: CR S7635)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7666-7669; text as passed Senate: CR S7666; text of measure as introduced: CR S7635)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates October 30, 2010, as a national day of remembrance for U.S. nuclear weapons program workers, including uranium miners, millers, and haulers. Encourages the people of the United States to support and participate in appropriate ceremonies, programs, and other activities to commemorate such date as a national day of remembrance for past and present workers in the U.S. nuclear weapons program.
Title
A resolution designating October 30, 2010, as a national day of remembrance for nuclear weapons program workers.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Jim Bunning [R-KY] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-28 | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7666-7669; text as passed Senate: CR S7666; text of measure as introduced: CR S7635) |
Same As/Similar To
HR423 (Related) 2009-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR790 (Related) 2009-10-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1623 (Related) 2010-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR151 (Related) 2009-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5766)
HR790 (Related) 2009-10-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1623 (Related) 2010-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR151 (Related) 2009-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5766)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-resolution/653/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/sres653/BILLS-111sres653ats.pdf |