US SR704 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7099-7100; text: CR S7090)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7099-7100; text: CR S7090)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the goals of National Adoption Day and National Adoption Month by promoting national awareness of adoption and the children awaiting families, celebrating children and families involved in adoption, and encouraging the people of the United States to secure safety, permanency, and well-being for all children.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the goals of National Adoption Day and National Adoption Month by promoting national awareness of adoption and the children awaiting families, celebrating children and families involved in adoption, and encouraging the people of the United States to secure safety, permanency, and well-being for all children.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-26 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7099-7100; text: CR S7090) |
Same As/Similar To
HR602 (Same As) 2017-11-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR1152 (Same As) 2018-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR331 (Same As) 2017-11-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7194; text: CR S7216-7217)
HR1152 (Same As) 2018-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR331 (Same As) 2017-11-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7194; text: CR S7216-7217)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/704/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres704/BILLS-115sres704ats.pdf |