US SR73 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1505-1506)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1505-1506)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating February 28, 2017, as "Rare Disease Day". Designates February 28, 2017, as Rare Disease Day. Expresses support for a national and global commitment to developing new treatments, diagnostics, and cures for rare diseases and disorders.
Title
A resolution designating February 28, 2017, as "Rare Disease Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1505-1506) |
Same As/Similar To
HR157 (Related) 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR423 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319)
SR423 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
World health
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/73/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres73/BILLS-115sres73ats.pdf |