UT HB0013 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Immunizations for Teen Mothers
Title
Immunizations for Teen Mothers
Sponsors
Rep. Jen Seelig [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2011-02-01 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-01-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-04 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-01-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-11-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0013.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0013.pdf |