UT HB0068 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial Driver License Amendments
Title
Commercial Driver License Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-10 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-11 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-11 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-31 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-31 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-12-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Commercial Driver License (CDL)
Commercial Motor Vehicle Regulation
Crimes
Department of Health
Department of Public Safety
Health
Human Trafficking
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Medical Examiner
Motor Vehicles
Transportation
Commercial Motor Vehicle Regulation
Crimes
Department of Health
Department of Public Safety
Health
Human Trafficking
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Medical Examiner
Motor Vehicles
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 3 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 3 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 3 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 3 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |