UT HB0103 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Salary Supplement for School Speech-language Pathologists and Audiologists
Title
Salary Supplement for School Speech-language Pathologists and Audiologists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-01 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |