UT HB0191 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nonresident Tuition Waiver Amendments
Title
Nonresident Tuition Waiver Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Wimmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | House/ substituted in HSUB | |
2011-02-18 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-18 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | House/ lifted from standing committee in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-06 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-01-05 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-09-28 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |