UT HB0195 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Land Use Planning Amendments
Title
Land Use Planning Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Owens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |