UT HB0219 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Divorce Imputed Income Requirements
Title
Divorce Imputed Income Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-21 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2024-02-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-19 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 12 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |