UT HB0248 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Inmate Amendments
Title
Inmate Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-11 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-08 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-29 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-06 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-02 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Colleges and Universities
Correctional Facilities
Crimes
Department of Corrections
Education
Electronic Databases
Government Records
Health and Human Services
Higher Education
Higher Education Students
Immigration
Indian Affairs
Inmates
Kidnapping
Labor and Employment
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Refugees
Scholarships and Financial Aid
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Technology
Utah National Guard
Veterans Affairs
Veterans and Military Affairs
Veterans and Military Benefits
Workforce Services
Colleges and Universities
Correctional Facilities
Crimes
Department of Corrections
Education
Electronic Databases
Government Records
Health and Human Services
Higher Education
Higher Education Students
Immigration
Indian Affairs
Inmates
Kidnapping
Labor and Employment
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Refugees
Scholarships and Financial Aid
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Technology
Utah National Guard
Veterans Affairs
Veterans and Military Affairs
Veterans and Military Benefits
Workforce Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53B | 1 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 35 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 35 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 8 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 27 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |