UT HB0274 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Credits for Employing a Homeless Person

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Credits for Employing a Homeless Person

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ filed in HFILE
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ to House in SSEC
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2013-03-08SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
2013-03-08SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTREV
2013-02-08SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in SSTREV
2013-02-07SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTREV
2013-02-06SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-02-06SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2013-02-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-02-04SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2013-02-04HouseHouse/ floor amendment in H3RDHB
2013-02-04HouseHouse/ uncircled in H3RDHB
2013-02-04HouseHouse/ circled in H3RDHB
2013-02-04HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2013-01-31HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2013-01-31HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTREV
2013-01-30HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV
2013-01-30HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTREV
2013-01-28HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTREV
2013-01-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-01-23HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK
2013-01-19HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK
2013-01-15HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2013-01-11 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2013-01-04 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-01-04 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-01-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback