UT HB0300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trampoline Park Safety Standards Act
Title
Trampoline Park Safety Standards Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Comm - Held in House Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |