UT HB0331 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Investment of Post-employment Benefits Amendments
Title
Investment of Post-employment Benefits Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB | |
2011-02-09 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-08 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0331.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0331.pdf |