UT HB0356S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0356
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New Convention Facility Development Incentive Provisions
Title
New Convention Facility Development Incentive Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-18 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-18 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDW |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSEC |
2014-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSEC |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-04 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2014-03-04 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-03-03 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTEDW |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTEDW |
2014-02-18 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2014-02-18 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDW |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0356 (Replaces) 2014-03-03 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Subjects
Business Development
Economic Development
Hotels and Hotel Keepers
Income Tax
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Economic Development
Hotels and Hotel Keepers
Income Tax
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax